VA HJR694 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-17-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-21 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ694ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-17-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-21 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ694ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing the Virginia Sports Hall of Fame and Museum. Recognizes the Virginia Sports Hall of Fame and Museum for its outstanding programs and exhibits as Virginia's official sports hall of fame and commending the 2011 inductees into the Virginia Sports Hall of Fame.
Title
Virginia Sports Hall of Fame and Museum; recognizing its outstanding program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Rules suspended (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-21 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ694ER) | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Taken up for immediate consideration | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Rules suspended (35-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Received | |
2011-01-20 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | House: Agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | House: Engrossed bill reprinted 11103335D-E | |
2011-01-20 | House: Printed as engrossed 11103335D-E | |
2011-01-20 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HJ694E | |
2011-01-20 | House: Amendment by Delegate Joannou agreed to | |
2011-01-20 | House: Taken up for immediate consideration | |
2011-01-18 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-01-17 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11103335D |