VA HJR68 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Transportation to study State Route 28; report. Requests that the Department of Transportation study the feasibility of implementing improvements to State Route 28 in Prince William County between the City of Manassas Park and Fairfax County.
Title
State Route 28; Department of Transportation to study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Rules |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103805D |