VA HJR635 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Constitutional amendment (first resolution); top two primary election. Provides for a top two primary election for the nomination of candidates for the offices of Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and Attorney General. All candidates for each office shall be listed on a single ballot, regardless of political party affiliation or independent status, and the two candidates receiving the highest and next highest number of votes cast for each office shall be the candidates at the general election for such office. The resolution requires that provision be made to allow votes to be cast at a top two primary election for persons other than the listed candidates, but prohibits such votes from being cast at the general election. Additionally, the resolution provides that the political parties shall not nominate candidates for the offices of Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and Attorney General and that the political parties do not have the right to have a preferred candidate on the ballot at the general election for the offices of Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and Attorney General. However, the political parties will have the right to contribute to, endorse, or otherwise support a candidate for the office of Governor, Lieutenant Governor, or Attorney General in accordance with law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment (first resolution); top two primary election.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-08HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2017-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N)
2017-01-11HouseAssigned P & E sub: Constitutional
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100852D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback