VA HJR629 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HJR629
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appointment; Chairman of the Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission. Confirms the appointment by the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court of Virginia of the Honorable Edward L. Hogshire as Chairman of the Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission.
Title
Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission; appointment of Chairman.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived |
2021-02-04 | House | VOTE: Agree To (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2021-02-04 | House | Taken up |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-26 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21103352D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR629 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)