VA HJR629 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HJR629
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ629ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ629ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appointment; Chairman of the Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission. Confirms the appointment by the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court of Virginia of the Honorable Edward L. Hogshire as Chairman of the Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission.
Title
Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission; appointment of Chairman.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ629ER) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived |
2021-02-04 | House | VOTE: Agree To (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2021-02-04 | House | Taken up |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-26 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21103352D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR629 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)