VA HJR601 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Agreed to by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Agreed to by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Herman J. Obermayer.
Title
Celebrating the life of Herman J. Obermayer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Received |
2017-02-09 | House | Agreed to by House |
2017-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-02-09 | House | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2017-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-27 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-13 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-05 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/11/17 17100745D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HJ601 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HJ601+hil |