VA HJR592 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Housing Commission; report. Directs the Virginia Housing Commission to study the administration and governance of common interest communities.
Title
Common interest communities; Virginia Housing Commission to study administration and governance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Rules |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2015-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100246D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HJ592 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HJ592+hil |