VA HJR578 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HJR578
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; database of criminal justice, behavioral health, and other human services records; report. Requests the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to establish a work group to study the feasibility of developing a secure, de-identified, renewable, and relational database of criminal justice, behavioral health, and other human services records to facilitate development of more effective interventions.
Title
Criminal justice, behavioral health, & other records; DBHDS to study feasibility of secure database.
Sponsors
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 1-N) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 1-N) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Reading waived |
2021-01-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House |
2021-01-27 | House | Taken up |
2021-01-25 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21102974D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR578 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)