VA HJR578 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HJR578

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Study; Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; database of criminal justice, behavioral health, and other human services records; report. Requests the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to establish a work group to study the feasibility of developing a secure, de-identified, renewable, and relational database of criminal justice, behavioral health, and other human services records to facilitate development of more effective interventions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal justice, behavioral health, & other records; DBHDS to study feasibility of secure database.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 1-N) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2021-02-23SenateRead third time
2021-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ578ER)
2021-02-22SenateReading waived (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-19SenateReported from Rules by voice vote
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-01-28SenateReading waived
2021-01-27HouseVOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27HouseAgreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27HouseEngrossed by House
2021-01-27HouseTaken up
2021-01-25HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2021-01-22HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-22HouseReported from Rules (17-Y 1-N)
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseAssigned Rules sub: Studies
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-01-13HousePresented and ordered printed 21102974D

Same As/Similar To

HJR578 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback