VA HJR552 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); registration of voters. Permits the General Assembly to provide by law for the use of a portion of an applicant's social security number on the voter registration application. Currently, an applicant is required to provide his full social security number in order to register to vote.
Title
Constitutional amendment; registration of voters (first reference).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-10 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional |
2016-12-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-12-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101672D |