VA HJR55 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Rail and Public Transportation; Commonwealth Corridor passenger rail service; report. Requests the Department of Rail and Public Transportation to study the feasibility of an east-west Commonwealth Corridor passenger rail service connecting Hampton Roads, Richmond, and the New River Valley.
Title
Commonwealth Corridor passenger rail service; DRPT to study feasibility of an east-west service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107473D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100972D |