VA HJR541 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); top two open primary election. Provides for a top two open primary election to be conducted to select the candidates for the offices of the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, or Attorney General, of the House of Delegates or the Senate of Virginia, and of the United States House of Representatives or Senate. All candidates for the particular office, regardless of the candidate's political party affiliation, appear on a single ballot, and the two candidates receiving the highest and next highest number of votes for that office, regardless of their political party affiliation, are the candidates at the ensuing general election for that office. Every qualified voter may vote for any candidate for an office at a top two open primary election, regardless of the political party affiliation of the candidate or the voter. The amendment further provides that the political parties have the right to endorse, support, or oppose any candidate at a top two open primary election or the ensuing general election, regardless of the political party affiliation of the candidate, but that the parties do not have the right to nominate candidates for an office at the top two open primary election or to have their preferred candidates participate in the general election if such candidates do not receive the highest or next highest number of votes at the top two open primary election for that office.
Title
Constitutional amendment; top two open primary election (first reference).
Sponsors
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-10 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional |
2016-09-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-09-15 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100294D |