VA HJR540 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); qualifications to vote. Removes the disqualification from voting of persons convicted of felonies.
Title
Constitutional amendment; qualifications to vote (first reference).
Sponsors
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] |
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. C.E. Hayes [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-10 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional |
2016-09-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-09-15 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100540D |