VA HJR5002 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on August 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-10 - VOTE: Rejected (29-Y 65-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-10 - VOTE: Rejected (29-Y 65-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Hydroxychloroquine; use for COVID-19 treatment. Encourages that hydroxychloroquine should be made available for treating COVID-19.
Title
Hydroxychloroquine; use for COVID-19 treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-10 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (29-Y 65-N) (Y: 29 N: 65 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-08-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-10 | House | VOTE: Rejected (29-Y 65-N) |
2020-09-10 | House | Rejected by House (29-Y 65-N) |
2020-09-10 | House | Taken up |
2020-09-10 | House | Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to |
2020-09-10 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-09 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-08 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-04 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-08-27 | House | Reported from Rules without recommendation (18-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-08-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200687D |