VA HJR5 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; ethics laws governing public officials; report. Establishes an 14-member joint subcommittee to evaluate the adequacy of Virginia's current ethics laws governing the conduct of public officials, including the General Assembly Conflicts of Interests Act and the State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act, and make recommendations for improvements in the laws and the procedures used to enforce them.
Title
Virginia's ethics laws; joint subcommittee to study laws governing public officials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Rules |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2013-11-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-11-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100096D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HJ5 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HJ5+hil |