VA HJR477 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ477ER)
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ477ER)
Summary
Commending Cecil E. McFarland.
Title
Commending Cecil E. McFarland.
Sponsors
Del. Kirkland Cox [R] | Del. William Howell [R] | Del. Johnny Joannou [D] | Del. Terry Kilgore [R] |
Del. James Massie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ477ER) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Received | |
2008-02-29 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-29 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2008-02-29 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2008-02-26 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 089130476 | |
2008-02-25 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 089130476 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HJ477 |