VA HJR442 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ442ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ442ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Lloyd F. Moss Free Clinic.
Title
Commending the Lloyd F. Moss Free Clinic.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Thomas [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Hyland Fowler [R] | Del. Robert Orrock [R] |
Del. Margaret Ransone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ442ER) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received |
2018-03-07 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2018-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House |
2018-03-01 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 18107269D |