VA HJR419 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ419ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ419ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Richmond Symphony Youth Orchestra Program.
Title
Commending the Richmond Symphony Youth Orchestra Program.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. George Loupassi [R] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] |
Sen. Joseph Morrissey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ419ER) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-02-27 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 12105425D | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Received | |
2012-02-24 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2012-02-24 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-02-21 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12105425D |