VA HJR402 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ402ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-09 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ402ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirming appointments by the Joint Committee on Rules and the Speaker of the House of Delegates. Confirms appointments by the Joint Committee on Rules to the Commonwealth Health Research Board, the Virginia Council for the Interstate Compact for Juveniles, and the Virginia Retirement System Board of Trustees and appointments by the Speaker of the House of Delegates to the Tobacco Region Revitalization Commission, the Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority Board of Directors, and the Virginia Conflict of Interest and Ethics Advisory Council.
Title
Rules, Joint Committee on, & the Speaker of the House of Delegates; confirming various appointments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N 4-A) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N 4-A) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ402ER) |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Reading waived |
2024-03-06 | House | VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N 4-A) |
2024-03-06 | House | Agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N 4-A) |
2024-03-06 | House | Engrossed by House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Reading waived |
2024-03-06 | House | Taken up |
2024-03-05 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-03-04 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24108490D |