VA HJR367 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ367ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ367ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Carolyn Winstead Meyers.
Title
Commending Carolyn Winstead Meyers.
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth Alexander [D] | Del. Algie Howell [D] | Del. William Howell [R] | Del. Johnny Joannou [D] |
Sen. Lynwood Lewis [D] | Del. Paula Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ367ER) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Received | |
2010-03-05 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2010-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2010-03-01 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 10105588D | |
2010-02-26 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 10105588D |