VA HJR346 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ346ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ346ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Just Neighbors.
Title
Commending Just Neighbors.
Sponsors
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] | Del. Richard Sullivan [D] |
Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ346ER) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Received |
2016-02-26 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2016-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House |
2016-02-24 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 16105415D |