VA HJR273 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Celebrating the life of Bijan C. Ghaisar.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Celebrating the life of Bijan C. Ghaisar.



2018-03-10SenateLeft in Rules
2018-02-19SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-02-16HouseAgreed to by House
2018-02-16HouseEngrossed by House
2018-02-13HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 18103991D

Virginia State Sources

Bill Comments