VA HJR236 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on February 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-19 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ236ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on February 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-19 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ236ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Virginia Councils of the Boy Scouts of America.
Title
Commending the Virginia Councils of the Boy Scouts of America.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ236ER) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Received | |
2010-02-09 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2010-02-09 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2010-02-09 | House: Taken up for immediate consideration | |
2010-02-08 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 10103379D | |
2010-02-03 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 10103379D |