VA HJR216 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - House: Introduced bill reprinted 12102951D
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - House: Introduced bill reprinted 12102951D
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
X & Y Chromosomal Variation Awareness Month. Designates May, in 2012 and in each succeeding year, as X & Y Chromosomal Variation Awareness Month in Virginia.
Title
X & Y Chromosomal Variation Awareness Month; designating as May 2012, and each succeeding year.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 12102951D | |
2012-02-29 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ216ER) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2012-02-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-02-03 | House: Taken up | |
2012-01-31 | House: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-01-18 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12102951D |