VA HJR200 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ200ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ200ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Opposing federal requirement of a law mandating a six-month driver's license suspension upon conviction of a drug offense. Expresses the opposition of the General Assembly to the enactment or enforcement of a law requiring a six-month revocation or suspension of a person's driver's license upon conviction of a drug offense. Absent a resolution from the General Assembly expressing such opposition, the failure to enforce such a law results in the withholding of certain federal highway funding by the U.S. Secretary of Transportation from the Commonwealth. Currently, such a law is codified in §§ 18.2-259.1 and 46.2-390.1.
Title
Driver's license; six-month suspension upon drug offense conviction.
Sponsors
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (55-Y 40-N) (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules (12-Y 5-N) (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (55-Y 40-N) (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules (12-Y 5-N) (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ200ER) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading waived |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Agree To (55-Y 40-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Agreed to by House (55-Y 40-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-02-10 | House | Taken up |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Rules (12-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-07 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20107902D |
2020-02-07 | House | Introduced at the request of Governor |