VA HJR195 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-05 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ195ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-05 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ195ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Lupus Awareness Month. Designates May, in 2010 and in each succeeding year, as Lupus Awareness Month in Virginia.
Title
Lupus Awareness Month; designating as May 2010, and each succeeding year thereafter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-05 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ195ER) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2010-02-19 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: #1 | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2010-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2010-02-08 | House: Taken up | |
2010-02-02 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-01-27 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10104433D | |
2010-01-27 | House: Unanimous consent to introduce |