VA HJR136 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing that global warming caused by human activity has resulted in a climate and ecological emergency. Expresses the sense of the General Assembly in recognizing that global warming caused by human activity that increases emissions of greenhouse gases has resulted in a climate and ecological emergency.
Title
Global warming; caused by human activity has resulted in a climate and ecological emergency.
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 36-N) (Y: 54 N: 36 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Rules (13-Y 5-N) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Rules (13-Y 5-N) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reading waived |
2020-01-29 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 36-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Agreed to by House (54-Y 36-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-01-29 | House | Taken up |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported from Rules (13-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20103339D |