VA HJR127 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC; court-appointed guardians and conservators; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC) to study the operations and performance of court-appointed guardians and conservators in the Commonwealth. In conducting its study, JLARC shall (i) identify the Commonwealth's laws that help prevent and remedy abuse, neglect, and exploitation of elderly and incapacitated persons; (ii) recommend any changes that should be made to the Commonwealth's laws to better prevent and remedy abuse, neglect, and exploitation of such persons, including instances in which abuse, neglect, or exploitation is committed by a court-appointed guardian or conservator; (iii) determine and recommend the maximum number of wards per guardian that should be permitted to ensure a high level of oversight and care; (iv) identify appropriate training, qualification, and oversight requirements for court-appointed guardians; (v) determine the types and amount of information that court-appointed guardians should be required to provide when making decisions on behalf of a ward and identify the parties to whom such information should be provided; and (vi) recommend one or more processes that could be implemented to allow for the receipt and investigation of complaints regarding the actions of court-appointed guardians.
Title
Court-appointed guardians and conservators; JLARC to study operations, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-08 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105341D |