VA HJR119 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ119ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ119ER)
Summary
Study; impact of eVA on small businesses in the Commonwealth. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC) to study the impact of eVirginia (eVA) on small businesses in the Commonwealth. In conducting its study, JLARC shall (i) identify the total number of contracts and the total dollar amount awarded to small businesses in the Commonwealth, annually, since the implementation of the eVA procurement system; and (ii) examine the impact of the fee structure and the mandatory use of eVA on the procurement opportunities of small businesses in the Commonwealth.
Title
Small business; Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study impact of eVirginia thereon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-12 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ119ER) | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 087325660-S1 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ119S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 087325660-S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 087325660-S1 | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2008-02-08 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ119H1 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 084230660-H1 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Taken up | |
2008-02-06 | House: Committee substitute printed 084230660-H1 | |
2008-02-05 | House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087028660 |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards and Institutions Generally
Computer Services and Uses
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Trade and Commerce
Computer Services and Uses
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Trade and Commerce
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HJ119 |