VA HJR115 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC; adequacy of prisoner educational and vocational training programs; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to (i) identify all educational and vocational training programs provided to prisoners in the Commonwealth; (ii) calculate the percentage of prisoners who participate in such educational and vocational training programs; (iii) identify and analyze any correlation between participation in such programs and successful reentry into the community, including correlations related to employment and recidivism; (iv) identify trades and industries within the Commonwealth with the greatest current need for employees and determine if educational and vocational training programs exist to prepare prisoners for such trades or industries; and (v) make recommendations to improve current educational and vocational training programs, create additional programs, and increase the number of prisoners participating in such programs.
Title
Prisoner educational and vocational training programs; JLARC to study the adequacy of programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102780D |