VA HJR100 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Transportation; Dulles Greenway ownership; report. Requests the Department of Transportation to study whether reductions in operating costs could be obtained through partial Commonwealth ownership of the Dulles Greenway.
Title
Dulles Greenway; Department of Transportation to study.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Rules |
2016-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102848D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HJ100 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HJ100+hil |