VA HB984 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0203)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Misclassification of workers; cause of action. Authorizes an individual who has not been properly classified as an employee to bring a civil action for damages against his employer for failing to properly classify the employee if the employer had knowledge of the individual's misclassification. The court may award damages in the amount of any wages, salary, employment benefits, including expenses incurred by the employee that would otherwise have been covered by insurance, or other compensation lost to the individual, a reasonable attorney fee, and the costs incurred by the employee in bringing the action. The measure provides that an individual who performs services for a person for remuneration shall be presumed to be an employee unless it is shown that the individual is an independent contractor as determined under the Internal Revenue Service guidelines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Misclassification of workers; cause of action.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (69-Y 30-N) (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0203)
2020-03-10 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 203 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020
2020-03-03HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020
2020-02-26SenateSigned by President
2020-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB984ER)
2020-02-25HouseEnrolled
2020-02-20SenatePassed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
2020-02-20SenateRead third time
2020-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N)
2020-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-05HouseVOTE: Passage (69-Y 30-N)
2020-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (69-Y 30-N)
2020-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-03HouseRead first time
2020-01-30HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (19-Y 3-N)
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105116D

Same As/Similar To

SB894 (Same As) 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40128.7:7(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback