VA HB983 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (7-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (7-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic incident management vehicles. Authorizes traffic incident management vehicles, defined in the bill, operated by persons who meet certain training requirements to be equipped with sirens and flashing red or red and white secondary warning lights and to be exempt from certain traffic regulations at or en route to the scene of a traffic accident or similar incident.
Title
Traffic incident management vehicles; equipped with certain lights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (7-Y 7-N) (Y: 7 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Transportation (7-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee amendments |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-30 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB983H2 |
2020-01-29 | House | Substitute by Delegate Delaney agreed to 20106896D-H2 |
2020-01-29 | House | Incorporates HB635 (LaRock) |
2020-01-29 | House | Floor substitute printed 20106896D-H2 (Delaney) |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee substitute rejected 20106269D-H1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-27 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-27 | House | Engrossment reconsidered by House |
2020-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-21 | House | Incorporates HB635 (LaRock) |
2020-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106269D-H1 |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104763D |
Same As/Similar To
HB635 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Incorporated by Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1023 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1029.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1030 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |