VA HB974 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign finance disclosure reports; custody and copying. Requires the State Board of Elections to replace in campaign finance disclosure reports the residence address of certain protected voters, such as law-enforcement officers, with the post office box address such protected voters may provide to be shown on public voter documents in lieu of their residence address, if requested to do so by any such protected voter.
Title
Campaign finance disclosure reports; requires SBE to replace residence address of certain voters.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 527 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-03 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-01 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-01 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB974ER) | |
2012-03-01 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-01 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-30 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-27 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100833D |