VA HB961 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0369)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0369)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cemeteries; registration; publication prior to sale. Expands provisions that allow localities to adopt an ordinance setting forth a register of identified cemeteries, graveyards, or other places of burial located on private property not belonging to any memorial or monumental association by providing that such localities shall publish a notice prior to the public sale of any publicly owned property that contains a known cemetery, graveyard, or other place of burial, or as soon thereafter as possible. The notice shall specify that a cemetery is present on the property. If the property falls under an exception provided for significant historic and archeological sites that would be jeopardized by public disclosure of their location, then no such notice is required. Cemeteries; registration; publication prior to sale. Expands provisions that allow localities to adopt an ordinance setting forth a register of identified cemeteries, graveyards, or other places of burial located on private property not belonging to any memorial or monumental association by providing that such localities shall publish a notice prior to the public sale of any publicly owned property that contains a known cemetery, graveyard, or other place of burial, or as soon thereafter as possible. The notice shall specify that a cemetery is present on the property. If the property falls under an exception provided for significant historic and archeological sites that would be jeopardized by public disclosure of their location, then no such notice is required.
Title
Cemeteries; registration, publication prior to sale.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 10-N) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 10-N) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0369) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 369 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB961ER) |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Adoption (91-Y 6-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (91-Y 6-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (89-Y 10-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (89-Y 10-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB961H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Substitute by Delegate Roem agreed to 22106601D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-14 | House | Floor substitute printed 22106601D-H1 (Roem) |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100951D |