VA HB960 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; marketing plan and report. Requires the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority (Authority) to include in its marketing plan information as to participation in trade shows and international marketing efforts, and development of performance measures that compare Virginia's marketing efforts with those of other states. The bill also requires that the Authority's annual marketing report include information on improvements upon prior years' results in meeting the goals and objectives as stated in the marketing plan and adds the Governor and the General Assembly to the list of entities to which the Authority must present an annual marketing report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; marketing plan information, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30HouseLeft in Appropriations
2018-02-09HouseContinued to 2019 in Appropriations by voice vote
2018-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101466D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222237.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback