VA HB950 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Firearms; access by children; penalty. Provides that it is a Class 1 misdemeanor to knowingly authorize a child age four or younger to use a firearm or pneumatic gun.
Title
Firearm or pneumatic gun; allowing access by children age four or younger, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101610D |