VA HB948 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-20 - Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

License taxes; prohibition on rate increases; prohibition on new taxes. Provides that any locality that levies license taxes shall be prohibited from increasing the rate of those taxes above the rate imposed as of January 1, 2020. The bill also prohibits any locality that does not levy license taxes from levying such a tax in the future.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License taxes; prohibition on rate increases, prohibition on new taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104260D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813736(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback