VA HB938 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0099)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0099)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Education; stakeholder group; evaluation of and recommendations for certain current and proposed policies and performance standards for public elementary and secondary schools. Requires the Board of Education to collaborate with the Superintendent of Public Instruction and the Secretary of Education to convene a group of stakeholders to include parents, public school principals, public school superintendents, public school board members, public school teachers, institutions of higher education, the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, industry partners and employers, and other concerned stakeholders to evaluate, to implement where possible, and to otherwise make recommendations to the General Assembly regarding the following goals: (i) promoting excellence in instruction and student achievement in mathematics; (ii) expanding the Advanced Studies Diploma as an option for students in public high schools in the Commonwealth; (iii) increasing the transparency and honesty of performance measures for public elementary and secondary schools in the Commonwealth; (iv) ensuring that performance measures for public elementary and secondary schools prioritize the attainment of grade-level proficiency and growth during the course of a school year and from school year to school year in reading and mathematics for all students, especially in grades kindergarten through five; (v) ensuring that the Commonwealth's proficiency standards on Standards of Learning assessments in reading and mathematics are maintained; and (vi) ensuring a strong accreditation system that promotes meaningful accountability year-over-year. The bill requires the Secretary of Education and the Superintendent of Public Instruction, no later than November 30, 2022, to report to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Education and the Senate Committee on Education and Health the results of such evaluation and recommendations to achieve such goals. Board of Education; stakeholder group; evaluation of and recommendations for certain current and proposed policies and performance standards for public elementary and secondary schools. Requires the Board of Education to collaborate with the Superintendent of Public Instruction and the Secretary of Education to convene a group of stakeholders to include parents, public school principals, public school superintendents, public school board members, public school teachers, institutions of higher education, the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, industry partners and employers, and other concerned stakeholders to evaluate, to implement where possible, and to otherwise make recommendations to the General Assembly regarding the following goals: (i) promoting excellence in instruction and student achievement in mathematics; (ii) expanding the Advanced Studies Diploma as an option for students in public high schools in the Commonwealth; (iii) increasing the transparency and honesty of performance measures for public elementary and secondary schools in the Commonwealth; (iv) ensuring that performance measures for public elementary and secondary schools prioritize the attainment of grade-level proficiency and growth during the course of a school year and from school year to school year in reading and mathematics for all students, especially in grades kindergarten through five; (v) ensuring that the Commonwealth's proficiency standards on Standards of Learning assessments in reading and mathematics are maintained; and (vi) ensuring a strong accreditation system that promotes meaningful accountability year-over-year. The bill requires the Secretary of Education and the Superintendent of Public Instruction, no later than November 30, 2022, to report to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Education and the Senate Committee on Education and Health the results of such evaluation and recommendations to achieve such goals.
Title
Public schools; evaluation & recommendations for certain current and proposed policies, revisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0099) | |
2022-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 99 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB938ER) |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22106901D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB938S1 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106901D-S1 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106901D-S1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 22104194D-E |
2022-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB938E |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Education with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104194D |
Subjects
Education
Elementary Schools
Public Schools
Students
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Elementary Schools
Public Schools
Students
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation