VA HB936 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0643)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0643)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax exemption; gold, silver, and platinum bullion. Extends from June 30, 2022, to June 30, 2025, the sunset date for the sales tax exemption for gold, silver, and platinum bullion and legal tender coins. The bill eliminates the limitation that only purchases in excess of $1,000 are eligible for the exemption. Sales tax exemption; gold, silver, and platinum bullion. Extends from June 30, 2022, to June 30, 2025, the sunset date for the sales tax exemption for gold, silver, and platinum bullion and legal tender coins. The bill eliminates the limitation that only purchases in excess of $1,000 are eligible for the exemption.
Title
Gold, silver, & platinum bullion, etc.; removes sunset date for sales tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (77-Y 19-N) (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (77-Y 21-N) (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (77-Y 19-N) (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (77-Y 21-N) (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0643) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 643 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB936ER) |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | VOTE: Adoption (77-Y 19-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (77-Y 19-N) |
2022-03-11 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-02-28 | House | Delegates: Batten, Ware, Keam |
2022-02-28 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senators: Ruff, Lucas, Deeds |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 22106621D-S1 (0-Y 98-N) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB936S1 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106621D-S1 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106621D-S1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-08 | House | VOTE: Passage (77-Y 21-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House (77-Y 21-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 22102736D-E |
2022-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB936E |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (17-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102736D |