VA HB93 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB93
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Sale or distribution of flavored tobacco products prohibited; civil penalty. Prohibits the sale or distribution of flavored tobacco products, defined in the bill, and creates a civil penalty of $1,000 for a first offense and $5,000 for a second or subsequent offense.
Title
Flavored tobacco products; sale or distribution prohibited, civil penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Continued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote |
2020-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-12-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100213D |
Same As/Similar To
HB93 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB93 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB93+hil |