VA HB908 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0924)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0924)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Naloxone; possession and administration; employee or person acting on behalf of a public place. Authorizes an employee or other person acting on behalf of a public place, as defined in the bill, who has completed a training program on the administration of naloxone or other opioid antagonist to possess and administer naloxone or other opioid antagonist, other than naloxone in an injectable formulation with a hypodermic needle or syringe, in accordance with protocols developed by the Board of Pharmacy in consultation with the Board of Medicine and the Department of Health. The bill also provides that a person who is not otherwise authorized to administer naloxone or other opioid antagonist used for overdose reversal may administer naloxone or other opioid antagonist used for overdose reversal to a person who is believed to be experiencing or about to experience a life-threatening opioid overdose. The bill provides immunity from civil liability for a person who, in good faith, administers naloxone or other opioid antagonist used for overdose reversal to a person who is believed to be experiencing or about to experience a life-threatening opioid overdose, unless such act or omission was the result of gross negligence or willful and wanton misconduct.
Title
Naloxone; possession and administration by employee or person acting on behalf of a public place.
Sponsors
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0924) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 924 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB908ER) |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB908H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107306D-H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Incorporates HB650 (Hope) |
2020-02-04 | House | Incorporates HB1466 (Gooditis) |
2020-02-04 | House | Incorporates HB 1465 (Gooditis) |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107306D-H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104833D |
Same As/Similar To
HB650 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions
HB1465 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions
HB1466 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions
HB1465 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions
HB1466 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions