VA HB906 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - House: Incorporated by Commerce and Labor (HB1036-Byron) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - House: Incorporated by Commerce and Labor (HB1036-Byron) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Security for Public Deposits Act; definition of public deposit; student activity funds. Includes in the definition of "public deposit" any funds derived from extracurricular public school activities, such as entertainment, athletic contest, cafeteria, club dues, etc., and from any and all activities of the school involving personnel, students, or property.
Title
Security for Public Deposits Act; includes extracurricular public school activities funds.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | House: Incorporated by Commerce and Labor (HB1036-Byron) by voice vote | |
2010-02-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-04 | House: Referred from General Laws by voice vote | |
2010-01-25 | House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102667D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB906 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB906+hil |