VA HB883 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Project labor agreements; prevailing wage; collective bargaining for employees of local governments. Provides that state agencies, when engaged in procuring products or services or letting contracts for construction, manufacture, maintenance, or operation of public works, paid for in whole or in part by state funds, shall neither require nor prohibit bidders to enter into or adhere to agreements with one or more labor organizations on the public works projects. The bill removes requirements for the payment of prevailing wage for work performed on public works contracts for state agencies. In addition, the bill removes the authority for a locality, by a local ordinance or resolution, to recognize any labor union or other employee association as a bargaining agent of any public officers or employees or to collectively bargain or enter into any collective bargaining contract with any such union or association or its agents. Project labor agreements; prevailing wage; collective bargaining for employees of local governments. Provides that state agencies, when engaged in procuring products or services or letting contracts for construction, manufacture, maintenance, or operation of public works, paid for in whole or in part by state funds, shall neither require nor prohibit bidders to enter into or adhere to agreements with one or more labor organizations on the public works projects. The bill removes requirements for the payment of prevailing wage for work performed on public works contracts for state agencies. In addition, the bill removes the authority for a locality, by a local ordinance or resolution, to recognize any labor union or other employee association as a bargaining agent of any public officers or employees or to collectively bargain or enter into any collective bargaining contract with any such union or association or its agents.
Title
Project labor agreements; prevailing wage, collective bargaining for employees of local governments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB883H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106252D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106252D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101705D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4321.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4321.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 51.19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 51.19:4.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 55 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 57.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 57.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |