VA HB880 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Withholding for individual income tax. Allows an employee to determine his taxes to be withheld for income tax purposes using anticipated itemized deductions in lieu of the standard deduction under the Code of Virginia.
Title
Income tax, state; withholding tax for an employee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | House | Left in Finance |
2016-02-15 | House | Continued to 2017 in Finance by voice vote |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote |
2016-02-09 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102628D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 461 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 462 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 470 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB880 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB880+hil |