VA HB876 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Child labor; tobacco farms; civil penalty. Prohibits any person from employing a child under the age of 18 to work in direct contact with tobacco plants or dried tobacco leaves unless (i) the owner of the farm or other location at which such work is conducted is the child's parent, grandparent, or legal guardian or (ii) the child's parent or legal guardian has consented in writing to such employment.
Title
Child labor; tobacco farms, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 2-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103212D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 1 | 100.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 78 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 79.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |