VA HB867 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - Senate: Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - Senate: Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eligibility for employment with community services board; removes provision allowing employment of person convicted of assault and battery of a family member. Eliminates provision authorizing employment of a person convicted of assault and battery of a family member at an adult substance abuse or adult mental health treatment program operated by a community services board.
Title
Community services boards; removes provision allowing employment of certain persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2011 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (66-Y 32-N) (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (66-Y 32-N) (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-02 | Senate: Left in Education and Health | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Pursuant to Senate Rule 20(L) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Subject matter referred by letter to the Joint Commission on Health Care | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Continued to 2011 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-10 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (66-Y 32-N) | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read third time and passed House (66-Y 32-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-04 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 9-N) | |
2010-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) | |
2010-01-20 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #3 | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102775D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Department of
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Crimes and Offenses Generally