VA HB867 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 29 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052)
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 29 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052)
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; regional industrial facility authorities; exemption. Authorizes regional industrial facility authorities to enter into certain contracts without competition.
Title
Public Procurement Act; regional industrial facility authorities to enter into certain contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052) | |
2008-02-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 52 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-20 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-19 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB867ER) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-01 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-30 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-29 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: FOIA | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086187576 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB867 |