VA HB859 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0313)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0313)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Stormwater management facilities; private residential lots; disclosure. Directs the State Water Control Board to adopt regulations requiring the owner of residential property on which is located a privately owned stormwater management facility serving one or more residential properties to record the long-term maintenance and inspection requirements for such stormwater management facility with the deed for the owner's property. The bill requires an owner of residential real property who has actual knowledge of a privately owned stormwater management facility located on the property to disclose to a purchaser of the property the long-term maintenance and inspection requirements of the facility.
Title
Stormwater management facilities; private residential lots, required disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 6-N) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (62-Y 34-N) (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (62-Y 34-N) (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0313) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 313 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB859ER) |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (29-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (62-Y 34-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (62-Y 34-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 20104540D-E |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB859E |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (19-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104540D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 1 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 708.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:28 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |