VA HB839 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act (FOIA); applicability to the Office of the Attorney General. Clarifies that for the purposes of FOIA applicable to access to public records, the Office of the Attorney General shall be considered a public body and, except as otherwise expressly provided by law, shall have the same obligations to disclose public records as other custodians of public records. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; applicability to Office of the Attorney General.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Left in General Laws |
2014-01-21 | House | Continued to 2015 in General Laws by voice vote |
2014-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100042D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB839 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB839+hil |